Waters v. Cheney
Plaintiff: Eugene Waters
Defendant: Dr. Cheney
Case Number: 3:2019cv00084
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Dudley H Bowen
Referring Judge: Brian K Epps
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing service of the #7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 12/20/2019. (thb)
December 20, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that this action be dismissed without prejudice as a sanction re #1 Complaint. Objections to R&R due by 1/6/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 12/20/2019. (thb)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Eugene Waters. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 12/20/2019. (thb)
December 18, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT by Prisoner Eugene Waters to collection of fees. (thb)
December 18, 2019 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Eugene Waters. (thb)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is directed to sign, date, and return the enclosed account forms to the Clerk within thirty days of the date of this Order. PLRA due by 12/13/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 11/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Prisoner Account Forms) (thb)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eugene Waters. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(JH)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dr. Cheney, filed by Eugene Waters.(JH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waters v. Cheney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Cheney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?