Miceli v. Cravey
Plaintiff: John Miceli
Defendant: Clifford Allen Cravey
Cross Claimant: Government Employees Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Co., GEICO Casualty Co., and/or GEICO General Insurance Co.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00088
Filed: December 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Dublin Office
Presiding Judge: Dudley H Bowen
Referring Judge: Brian K Epps
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer and nunc pro tunc extending the deadline through and including January 23, 2020 and accepting as timely GEICO's answer to Plaintiff's complaint; finding as moot #16 Motion to Set Aside Default is moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 01/27/2020. (thb)
January 24, 2020 Filing 20 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Government Employees Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Co., GEICO Casualty Co., and/or GEICO General Insurance Co.. (Lawrence, Matthew)
January 24, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #16 MOTION to Set Aside Default. (pts)
January 24, 2020 Filing 19 Brief in Support re #16 MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by Government Employees Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Co., GEICO Casualty Co., and/or GEICO General Insurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit)(Lawrence, Matthew)
January 24, 2020 Filing 18 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Government Employees Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Co., GEICO Casualty Co., and/or GEICO General Insurance Co.. (Lawrence, Matthew)
January 24, 2020 MOTION REFERRED: #15 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (thb)
January 23, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Set Aside Default by Government Employees Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Co., GEICO Casualty Co., and/or GEICO General Insurance Co.. Responses due by 2/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit C. Peters, #2 Affidavit M. Lawrence)(Lawrence, Matthew)
January 23, 2020 Filing 15 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Government Employees Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Co., GEICO Casualty Co., and/or GEICO General Insurance Co.. Responses due by 2/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit C. Peters, #2 Affidavit M. Lawrence)(Lawrence, Matthew)
January 23, 2020 Filing 13 GEICO's ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Clifford Allen Cravey by Government Employees Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Co., GEICO Casualty Co., and/or GEICO General Insurance Co..(Lawrence, Matthew)
December 18, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Clifford Allen Cravey answer due 12/27/2019. (thb)
December 13, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Miceli. Clifford Allen Cravey served on 12/6/2019, answer due 12/27/2019. (Rockefeller, A.) Modified on 12/18/2019 (thb).
December 13, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Government Employees Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Co., GEICO Casualty Co., and/or GEICO General Insurance Co. answer due 1/1/2020. (jlh)
December 13, 2019 ***Entered in Error*** (pts) Modified on 12/13/2019 (jlh).
December 12, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Government Employees Insurance Company c/o CT Corporation Systems, Registered Agent on 12/11/2019, filed by John Miceli. (Rockefeller, A.) Modified on 12/13/2019 (jlh).
December 10, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Government Employees Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Co., GEICO Casualty Co., and/or GEICO General Insurance Co. (thb)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 First Motion to Serve Summons on Non-Party. The Clerk is instructed to issue the proposed summons attached to the motion as Exhibit 2. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 12/10/2019. (thb)
December 9, 2019 MOTION REFERRED: #8 First MOTION to Serve Summons on Non-Party. (jlh)
December 6, 2019 Filing 8 First MOTION to Serve Summons on Non-Party by John Miceli. Responses due by 12/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Filed Complaint (D1), #2 Exhibit Proposed Summons GEICO)(Rockefeller, A.) Modified on 12/9/2019 (jlh).
December 5, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Clifford Allen Cravey. (jlh)
December 5, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Submitted (Rockefeller, A.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/5/2019: #2 Corrected Main Document) (jlh).
December 5, 2019 Filing 5 ***Entered in Error*** Summons Submitted (Rockefeller, A.) Modified on 12/5/2019 (jlh).
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 12/05/2019. (Attachments: #1 Blank Forms.) (jlh)
December 4, 2019 Filing 2 Litigants' Bill of Rights by John Miceli. (jlh)
December 4, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 113J-2735925. (jlh) Modified on 12/5/2019 (jlh).
December 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Clifford Allen Cravey, filed by John Miceli. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet.)(jlh) Modified on 12/5/2019 (jlh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miceli v. Cravey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clifford Allen Cravey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Miceli
Represented By: A. James Rockefeller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Government Employees Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Co., GEICO Casualty Co., and/or GEICO General Insurance Co.
Represented By: Matthew R. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?