Laufer v. PSNVR LLC
Plaintiff: Deborah Laufer
Defendant: PSNVR LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00052
Filed: August 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Dudley H Bowen
Referring Judge: Brian K Epps
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12117
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Settlement by Deborah Laufer (Gillespie, Tristan)
August 28, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deborah Laufer. PSNVR LLC served on 8/24/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (Gillespie, Tristan)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 8/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Forms) (pts)
August 11, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to PSNVR LLC. (pts)
August 11, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number AGASDC-2901043. (pts)
August 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PSNVR LLC, filed by Deborah Laufer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pts)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laufer v. PSNVR LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Laufer
Represented By: Tristan Wade Gillespie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PSNVR LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?