Coleman et al v. Ward et al
Plaintiff: David E. Roberts, Torrey Coleman, Trayon Dunbar, Kadeem R. Terry, Antonio Ellison, Thomas Young, Charles Rice, Rangel Alvarez Raul, Cody Humphrey and Raul Rangel-Alvarez
Defendant: Deputy Warden Wicker, Deputy Warden Keith, Tim Ward, Jermaine White, Deputy Warden Beasley and Director Sheppard
Case Number: 3:2020cv00079
Filed: December 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Dudley H Bowen
Referring Judge: Brian K Epps
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2021 Filing 23 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 02/01/2021. (jlh)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER ADOPTING the #13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS as the Court's opinion, dismissing this case without prejudice, and directing the clerk to file and docket the instant complaint in nine new lawsuits along with the motion to proceed IFP. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 02/01/2021. (jlh)
January 13, 2021 Filing 21 DECLARATION re Lack of Security, by Torrey Coleman. (jlh)
January 11, 2021 Filing 20 DECLARATION by Torrey Coleman, Trayon Dunbar, Antonio Ellison, Charles Rice, David E. Roberts, and Kadeem R. Terry. (jlh)
January 11, 2021 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT against all Defendants, filed by David E. Roberts, Charles Rice, Raul Rangel-Alvarez, Torrey Coleman, Cody Humphrey, Trayon Dunbar.(jlh)
January 7, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Change of Address by Raul Rangel-Alvarez. (jlh)
January 7, 2021 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Imminent Danger, by Thomas Young, Antonio Ellison, David E. Roberts, Kadeem R. Terry, Charles Rice, Torrey Coleman, Cody Humphrey, Trayon Dunbar. (jlh) Modified on 1/7/2021 (jlh).
December 28, 2020 Filing 16 Inmate Account Statement by Charles Rice. (pts)
December 28, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Charles Rice. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(jlh)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER directing service of the #13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on all parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 12/11/2020. (jlh)
December 11, 2020 Filing 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that this case be dismissed without prejudice, the Clerk be directed to file and docket the instant complaint in nine new lawsuits, and the Clerk be directed to file and docket Plaintiffs' motion for appointment of counsel, proposed summons, and individual motions to proceed IFP in the new case number associated with them. Objections to R&R due by 12/31/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 12/11/2020. (jlh)
December 9, 2020 Filing 12 Summons Submitted. (jlh)
December 9, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, by Torrey Coleman, Trayon Dunbar, Antonio Ellison, Cody Humphrey, Rangel Alvarez Raul, Charles Rice, David E. Roberts, Kadeem R. Terry, and Thomas Young. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps. (jlh)
December 9, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Charles Rice. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps. (jlh)
December 9, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by David E. Roberts. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps. (jlh)
December 9, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Trayon Dunbar. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps. (jlh)
December 9, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Kadeem R. Terry. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps. (jlh)
December 9, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Thomas Young. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps. (jlh)
December 9, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Rangel Alvarez Raul. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps. (jlh)
December 9, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Cody Humphrey. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps. (jlh)
December 9, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Torrey Coleman. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps. (jlh)
December 9, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Antonio Ellison. (Attachment: #1 Declaration.) REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps. (jlh)
December 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all Defendants, filed by Thomas Young, Antonio Ellison, David E. Roberts, Kadeem R. Terry, Charles Rice, Rangel Alvarez Raul, Torrey Coleman, Cody Humphrey, Trayon Dunbar. (Attachment: #1 Appendix.) (jlh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/9/2020: #2 Exhibit A) (jlh). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/9/2020: #3 Text of Proposed Order to Show Cause for a Preliminary Injunction and a TRO) (jlh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman et al v. Ward et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Warden Wicker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Warden Keith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jermaine White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Warden Beasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David E. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Torrey Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trayon Dunbar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kadeem R. Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Ellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rangel Alvarez Raul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cody Humphrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raul Rangel-Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?