Hodge v. Beasley et al
Plaintiff: Quincy Demone Hodge
Defendant: Jacob Beasley, Telfair State Prison and Georgia Department of Corrections
Case Number: 3:2021cv00040
Filed: July 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Dudley H Bowen
Referring Judge: Brian K Epps
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, by Quincy Demone Hodge. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps. (jlh)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re: #5 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to pay the filing fee. Plaintiff shall have through and including August 27, 2021, to pay the $402.00 filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 8/13/2021. (csr)
August 13, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 8/27/2021 re: #8 Order. (csr)
August 11, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint by Quincy Demone Hodge. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(ca)
August 9, 2021 Filing fee: $402, receipt number AUG029694. (maa)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to pay the filing fee. Plaintiff shall have through and including August 24, 2021, to request the $402.00 filing fee be sent to the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on July 21, 2021. (jrb)
July 21, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to have funds sent to the Court filed by Quincy Demone Hodge re: #3 Order. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps. (csr)
July 21, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 8/24/2021 re #5 Order. (thb)
July 14, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 8/3/2021 re #3 Order. (thb)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff must remit the full $402.00 filing fee within twenty-one days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 07/13/2021. (jlh)
July 2, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Quincy Demone Hodge. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps. (jlh)
July 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all Defendants, filed by Quincy Demone Hodge. (jlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hodge v. Beasley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Beasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Telfair State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quincy Demone Hodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?