Beaubrun v. Georgia Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Thony Beaubrun
Defendant: Georgia Department of Corrections, Timothy C. Ward and Warden TOMMY BOWEN
Case Number: 3:2022cv00002
Filed: January 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Dudley H Bowen
Referring Judge: Brian K Epps
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2022 Filing 37 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Thony Beaubrun. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps. (csr)
March 4, 2022 Filing 36 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Thony Beaubrun. (csr)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS #30 of the Magistrate Judge, as modified herein, as its opinion and Dismisses without prejudice all motions pending at the time of transfer from the Middle District of Georgia #4 , #8 , #10 , #11 , #13 , #14 , #19 - #22 , #24 , #25 and terminating Plaintiff's #34 Motion to Amend. As to any prisoners other than Plaintiff who signed the complaint but were not listed in the caption and did not submit a motion to proceed in forma pauperis, those individuals and their claims are Dismissed without prejudice. The Court Overrules the objection regarding the recommendation that Plaintiff submit an amended complaint in accordance with the instructions provided in the Report and Recommendation. Plaintiff shall have thirty days from the undersigned date to submit an amended complaint. The Court Directs the Clerk to attach a standard complaint form to the service copy of this Order. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 2/3/2022. (ca) Modified on 2/4/2022 (pts). Modified on 2/7/2022 (JH).
February 3, 2022 Reset Deadlines: Amended Complaint due by 3/5/2022. (ca)
January 31, 2022 Filing 34 MOTION to Amend/Correct #3 Complaint, by Thony Beaubrun. Responses due by 2/14/2022. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(kjm)
January 26, 2022 Filing 33 MOTION/OBJECTION to #30 Report and Recommendations by Thony Beaubrun. (gmh)
January 21, 2022 Filing 32 Letter from Thony Beaubrun. (gmh)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER directing service of the #30 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 1/10/2022. (ca)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that all motions #4 . #8 , [10, #11 , #13 , #14 , #19 - #22 , #24 , #25 pending at the time of transfer be Denied without prejudice. Should Judge Bowen adopt this recommendation, Plaintiff shall have fourteen days from the date of Judge Bowens' Order to submit an amended complaint. Objections to R&R due by 1/27/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 1/10/2022. (ca)
January 5, 2022 Filing 29 NOTICE to all Counsel of Record re Transfer. (jlh)
January 5, 2022 Filing 28 Case transfer in from District of Georgia Northern; Case Number 1:21-cv-03463. Case transferred electronically
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that this case be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Georgia. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 1/5/2022. (abm)
January 5, 2022 Case electronically transferred to Southern District of Georgia. (abm)
January 5, 2022 Civil Case Terminated. (abm)
January 5, 2022 MOTIONS REFERRED: #19 , #22 , #21 , #24 , #20 , #25 . (thb)
January 4, 2022 Submission of #19 MOTION for Objection, #21 MOTION Order for Early Release, #20 MOTION for Reply Answer, #24 MOTION to Compel Discovery Subpoena, #22 MOTION for an Amend Class Actions Lawsuit, #25 MOTION Cross Motiom for Summary Judgment or for Sanctions Granted by the District Courts of the United States, to District Judge William M. Ray II. (jkl)
December 23, 2021 Submission of #23 Order to Show Cause, to District Judge William M. Ray II. (bgt)
December 22, 2021 Filing 26 RESPONSE TO #23 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Thony Beaubrun. (bgt)
December 17, 2021 Filing 25 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment or for Sanctions Granted by the District Courts of the United States by Thony Beaubrun. (abm)
December 17, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION to Compel Discovery Subpoena by Thony Beaubrun. (abm)
December 7, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Thony Beaubrun re #23 Order to Show Cause. (cmd)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Within 21 days of this order, Plaintiffs are ORDERED to show cause why venue is proper in this Court and why the Court should not transfer this case to the District Court for the Southern District of Georgia. The Clerk is DIRECTED to submit this matter to the Court 28 days after this order. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 12/6/2021. (cmd)
December 2, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION for an Amend Class Actions Lawsuit (missing pages 17 and 19)by Thony Beaubrun. (abm)
December 2, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION Order for Early Release by Thony Beaubrun. (abm)
December 2, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION for Reply Answer by Thony Beaubrun. (abm)
December 2, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for Objection by Thony Beaubrun. (abm)
November 29, 2021 Submission of #16 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #3 Complaint, filed by Thony Beaubrun, to District Judge William M. Ray II. (abm)
November 5, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Warden, Dodge State Prison re #16 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. (cmd)
November 5, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Thony Beaubrun re #16 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #3 Complaint, filed by Thony Beaubrun, #17 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation,. (cmd)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 --ORDER ENTERED IN ERROR (WRONG CASE)-- ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the parties file an amended JPR with complete responses within TEN (10) DAYS of entry of this Order. Failure to comply shall result in a recommendation to the District Judge that he impose sanctions, which may include the dismissal of this action or the striking of pleadings. The Clerk is DIRECTED to submit this action to the undersigned in THIRTEEN (13) DAYS for further consideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 11/4/2021. (cmd) Modified on 11/5/2021 to restrict entry. (cmd)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER for Service of #16 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 11/4/2021. (cmd)
November 4, 2021 Filing 16 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #3 Complaint RECOMMENDING that this action be DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 11/4/2021. (cmd)
November 4, 2021 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: It is RECOMMENDED that Beaubrun's motion for appointment of counsel (Doc. #4 ) be DENIED, James Kurtz's motion for issuance of subpoena (Doc. #8 ) be DENIED, Beaubrun's motion for declaration (Doc. #10 ) be DENIED, Beaubrun's motion for issuance of subpoena (Doc. #11 ) be DENIED, Amos's motion of declaration (Doc. #13 ) be DENIED, and Amos's motion for issuance of subpoena (Doc. #14 ) be DENIED. Ruled on by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 11/4/2021 within the #16 R&R. (cmd)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER GRANTING In Forma Pauperis, allowing Plaintiff to proceed IFP, however, Plaintiff is obligated to pay $350.00 as funds are deposited into Inmate account. The Warden or the designee shall collect the monthly payments and remit to Clerk until $350.00 is paid in full. Ruled on by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 11/4/2021 within the #16 R&R. (cmd)
October 28, 2021 Submission of #8 MOTION for Issuance of Subpoena, #14 MOTION for Issuance of Subpoena, #13 MOTION, #11 MOTION for Issuance of Subpoena, #10 MOTION, to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (cmd)
October 15, 2021 Submission of #5 Order to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (cmd)
September 23, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE Of Filing Proposed Summons by Amos James. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (bgt)
September 23, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Issuance of Subpoena by Amos James. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (bgt)
September 23, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION of Declaration by Amos James (page "3" not included in document sent to clerk's office). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Envelope) (bgt) Modified on 9/26/2021 to add note (bgt).
September 23, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE Of Filing Proposed Summons by Thony Beaubrun (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (bgt)
September 23, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Issuance of Subpoena by Thony Beaubrun. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (bgt)
September 23, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Declaration by Thony Beaubrun. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Envelope) (bgt)
September 23, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE Of Filing Proposed Summons by James Kurtz. (bgt)
September 23, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Issuance of Subpoena by James Kurtz. (bgt)
September 23, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE Of Filing Declaration by James Kurtz. (bgt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/26/2021: #1 Order to Show Cause) (bgt).
September 13, 2021 Filing 6 Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account by Thony Beaubrun. (rjc)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #1 ) is DENIED without prejudice. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send Plaintiff an application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis stamped with the case number for this action. Plaintiff is ORDERED to pay the $350.00 filing and $52.00 administrative fees or complete and submit the application within 30 days of the date this Order is entered. Plaintiff is cautioned that he must pay the full $350.00 filing fee for this case from his inmate account even if he is allowed to proceed in forma pauperis. During the pendency of his case, Plaintiff must keep the Clerk of Court advised of his correct address at all times. The Clerk is DIRECTED to resubmit this action to the undersigned upon receipt of the required fees or application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis or at the expiration of the aforementioned time period. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 8/25/2021. (tcc)
August 25, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Thony Beaubrun re #5 Order, Forms sent to party: Affidavit and Authorization. (tcc)
August 24, 2021 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis for ifp and frivolity determination, to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (tcc)
August 24, 2021 Submission of #4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (tcc)
August 23, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Thony Beaubrun. (tcc)
August 23, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT filed by Thony Beaubrun. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(tcc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
August 23, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE Of Filing Exhibits by Thony Beaubrun re #3 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Envelope)(cmd)
August 23, 2021 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Thony Beaubrun. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel, #4 Proposed Summons)(tcc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beaubrun v. Georgia Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thony Beaubrun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy C. Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden TOMMY BOWEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?