Travelers Property Casualty Company of America v. Hardee et al
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Defendant: Nicholas Hardee, Jessie Hardee Bass and Nicole Hardee
Case Number: 3:2022cv00004
Filed: January 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Dudley H Bowen
Referring Judge: Brian K Epps
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgment (Insurance)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Counterclaim, #6 Answer to Complaint Counterclaim. Travelers Property Casualty Company of America answer due 3/15/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 3/1/22. (cmr)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Counterclaim by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. Responses due by 3/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Ex. A - Proposed Order)(Meeks, Christopher)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED: #11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Counterclaim. (thb)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave of Absence for Attorney Seth M. Friedman for the following dates: March 2 - 7, 2022; May 20 - 26, 2022; July 18 - 25, 2022; and December 19 - 28, 2022. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 02/11/2022. (jlh)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Travelers Property Casualty Company of America for dates of : March 2, 2022, March 3, 2022, March 4, 2022, March 5, 2022, March 6, 2022 and March 7, 2022, May 20, 2022, May 21, 2022, May 22, 2022, May 23, 2022, May 24, 2022, May 25, 2022, May 26, 2022, July 18, 2022, July 19, 2022, July 20, 2022, July 21, 2022, July 22, 2022, July 23, 2022, July 24, 2022 and July 25, 2022, December 19, 2022, December 20, 2022, December 21, 2022, December 22, 2022, December 23, 2022, December 24, 2022, December 25, 2022, December 26, 2022, December 27, 2022 and December 28, 2022 by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. Responses due by 2/23/2022. (Friedman, Seth)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF RESTRICTION OF DISCOVERY RELATED DOCUMENT re: #7 Certificate of Service. (slt)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DISCOVERY RELATED DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jessie Hardee Bass, Nicholas Hardee, Nicole Hardee (Floyd, Graham) Modified on 2/8/2022 (slt).
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint , First COUNTERCLAIM against Travelers Property Casualty Company of America by Jessie Hardee Bass, Nicholas Hardee, Nicole Hardee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Floyd, Graham)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed February 4, 2022 Acknowledgement filed by Jessie Hardee Bass, Nicholas Hardee, Nicole Hardee. (Floyd, Graham)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Jessie Hardee Bass answer due 2/25/2022; Nicholas Hardee answer due 2/25/2022; Nicole Hardee answer due 2/25/2022. (slt)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America identifying N as Corporate Parent. (Meeks, Christopher) Modified on 1/25/2022 (csr).
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 1/14/2021. (maa)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Jessie Hardee Bass, Nicholas Hardee, Nicole Hardee. (maa)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jessie Hardee Bass, Nicholas Hardee, Nicole Hardee, filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. Filing fee paid: AGASDC-3264638, $402. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Policy, #3 Exhibit B - Supplementary Commercial Auto App, #4 Exhibit C - August 20, 2021 Demand, #5 Exhibit D - September 8, 2021 Letter, #6 Exhibit E - November 3, 2021 Letter, #7 Exhibit F - November 5, 2021 Letter, #8 Exhibit G - Underlying Complaint)(maa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America v. Hardee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Represented By: Seth M. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Hardee
Represented By: Graham F. Floyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessie Hardee Bass
Represented By: Graham F. Floyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Hardee
Represented By: Graham F. Floyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?