BELL v. WARD et al
Plaintiff: Clayton Bell
Defendant: Timothy Ward, WARDEN Antinio Caldwell, BRAGG and Georgia Department of Corrections
Case Number: 3:2022cv00040
Filed: May 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Dublin Office
Presiding Judge: Dudley H Bowen
Referring Judge: Brian K Epps
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Fee Deficiency. Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 5/31/2022. (Attachments: #1 AO 240) (pts)
May 10, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Transfer. (pts)
May 10, 2022 Filing 7 Case transfer in from District of Georgia Middle; Case Number 5:22-cv-00143. Case transferred electronically
May 10, 2022 Case Electronically Transferred Out - District Transfer to Southern District of Georgia, Dublin Division. All documents, including a certified copy of the docket sheet and pleading were transferred electronically. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.**(Case Transfer Acknowledgment deadline 5/24/2022.) (tam)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER dismissing Plaintiff's claims against the Georgia Department of Corrections and the GDC Commissioner Timothy Ward. Because Plaintiffs remaining claims arise from events occurring at the Johnson State Prison and all remaining Defendants appear to be located there, Plaintiffs remaining claims and his pending motions are TRANSFERRED to the Southern District of Georgia for further review. The Clerk is directed to TRANSFER this action and all pending motions to the Dublin Division of the Southern District of Georgia for further review. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 5/6/2022. (chc) Modified on 5/10/2022 to correct order date (tam).
April 15, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Produce Documents and Records Filed by CLAYTON BELL. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(tam)
April 15, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Filed by CLAYTON BELL. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(tam)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (tam)
April 6, 2022 Filing 2 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by CLAYTON BELL (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tam)
April 6, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by CLAYTON BELL. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(tam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BELL v. WARD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clayton Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARDEN Antinio Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRAGG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?