Villalobos-Hernandez v. Stone
Petitioner: Cristian Eduardo Villalobos-Hernandez
Respondent: Stacey N. Stone
Case Number: 3:2022cv00108
Filed: September 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Dudley H Bowen
Referring Judge: Brian K Epps
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Federal)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: In Re McRae Correctional Facility. (Compliance due by 11/18/2022.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 11/7/2022. (ca)
October 11, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Stacey N. Stone. Responses due by 10/25/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Littlejohn Declaration)(Leithart, Otto)
October 11, 2022 MOTIONS REFERRED: #6 MOTION to Dismiss. (JH)
September 29, 2022 Filing 5 U.S. Marshal Return as to Attorney General of the U.S. on 9/20/22. USMS Service Remark - Certificate of Service was signed by E. Sase on 9/20/22. (wwp)
September 28, 2022 Filing 4 U.S. Marshal Return Executed as to Civil Process Clerk, U.S. Attorney on 9/20/22. USMS Service Remark - Certificate of Service was signed by Sharon Bennett on 9/20/22. (wwp) Modified on 9/28/2022 (wwp).
September 28, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Stacey N. Stone answer due 10/11/2022. (wwp)
September 20, 2022 Filing 3 U.S. Marshal Return Executed as to Stacey N. Stone on 9/16/22. USMS Service Remark - Certificate of Service was signed for by R. Brown on 9/16/22. (wwp)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Directing USMS Service of Process re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus upon: (1) the Attorney General of the United States; (2) the named Respondent; and (3) the civil process clerk at the office of the United States Attorney for the Southern District of Georgia. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 09/13/2022. (Attachments: #1 USM Form - Attorney General, #2 USM Form - Respondent, # and (3) USM Form - Civil Process Clerk.) (jlh)
September 13, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance re #2 Order service packets due by 9/16/2022. (jlh)
September 9, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Cristian Eduardo Villalobos-Hernandez.(wwp)
September 9, 2022 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 100000084. (wwp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Villalobos-Hernandez v. Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Cristian Eduardo Villalobos-Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Stacey N. Stone
Represented By: Otto Woelke Leithart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?