Evans v. The Dodge County Sheriff's Department et al
Plaintiff: Aubrey Paul Evans
Defendant: The Dodge County Sheriff's Department, Ofc. Walt Turner and Ofc. Dillon Warren
Case Number: 3:2022cv00132
Filed: September 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Dudley H Bowen
Referring Judge: Brian K Epps
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2022 Filing 7 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 11/21/2022. (gmh)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ADOPTING #4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and dismissing this case without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to terminate all pending motions and deadlines and to close this civil action. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 11/21/2022. (gmh)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing service of the #4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on all parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 10/21/2022. (jlh)
October 21, 2022 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that this case be dismissed without prejudice due to Plaintiff not signing his complaint. Objections to R&R due by 11/7/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 10/21/2022. (jlh)
September 29, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Deficiency re #1 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 10/13/2022. (pts)
September 29, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Aubrey Paul Evans. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(maa)
September 29, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Aubrey Paul Evans.(maa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. The Dodge County Sheriff's Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aubrey Paul Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Dodge County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ofc. Walt Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ofc. Dillon Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?