Glenn v. White et al
Plaintiff: Del'Ron Glenn
Defendant: Jimmy Kellom, Jermaine White, John Does, Ricky Wilcox and Andrew McFarlane
Case Number: 3:2024cv00058
Filed: August 12, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Dudley H Bowen
Referring Judge: Brian K Epps
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have fourteen days from the date of this Order to inform the Court of his intentions regarding this case by complying with the Court's Order directing payment of an initial filing fee of $4.17 or by showing the Court why he has not complied with the Order directing the payment. The CLERK is DIRECTED to immediately inform the Court of any payment of the initial filing fee which is received from Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 10/10/24. (loh)
October 10, 2024 Set/Reset Deadline: Compliance re #8 Order due by 10/24/2024. (loh)
September 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Del'Ron Glenn and ordering Plaintiff to pay an initial fee of $4.17 within thirty days from the date of this Order. (Compliance due by 10/4/2024.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 09/04/2024. (jlh)
September 4, 2024 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement. (wwp)
September 4, 2024 Filing 5 CONSENT by Prisoner Del'Ron Glenn to collection of fees. (wwp)
August 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff must return both the Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement and the Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account to the Clerk within thirty days of this Order. PLRA due by 9/12/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 8/13/24. (loh)
August 12, 2024 Filing 3 Inmate Account Statement by Del'Ron Glenn. (wwp)
August 12, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Del'Ron Glenn. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(wwp)
August 12, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Del'Ron Glenn, filed by Del'Ron Glenn.(wwp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glenn v. White et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Kellom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jermaine White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricky Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew McFarlane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Del'Ron Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?