Hammond v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Rhonda K. Hammond
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 4:2011cv00045
Filed: February 22, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
County: Effingham
Presiding Judge: G. R. Smith
Presiding Judge: William T. Moore
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:1383
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER adopting 18 Report and Recommendations, and affirming the Commissioner's decision. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 04/11/2012. (thb)
March 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER directing all parties to be served re 18 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Rhonda K. Hammond. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 3/19/2012. (loh)
July 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER stating that counsel for the parties submit briefs in accordance with the following requirements. Within thirty days from the entry of this Order, plaintiff shall serve and file a brief setting forth all errors which plaintiff contends entitle the plaintiff to relief. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 7/7/2011. (loh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hammond v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda K. Hammond
Represented By: Charles E. Binder
Represented By: Shelley Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?