Williams v. Humphrey
Petitioner: Joseph Williams
Respondent: Carl Humphrey
Case Number: 4:2012cv00106
Filed: April 18, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
County: Chatham
Presiding Judge: William T. Moore
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 104 CORRECTED ORDER DENYING re 95 MOTION for Reconsideration. RE: 101 Order on Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 5/21/20. (jrb)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER denying 95 Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Procedural Default Order and to amend Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 4/27/20. (wwp)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting re 96 Motion for Nunc Pro Tunc Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 10/10/19. (loh)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting 91 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 92 Motion Waive Pro Hac Vice Admission Fee. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 07/10/2019. (evk)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER that the parties are on notice that they are expected to comply with the briefing schedule 26 and that no extensions will be granted by the Court. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 4/3/19. (jrb)
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting 48 Motion for Leave to Appear ; granting 49 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting 50 Motion to waive pro hac fee. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 1/22/16. (wwp)
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER denying 44 Motion to Stay; granting 44 Motion for Extension of Time. Responses due by 11/2/2015. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 9/30/15. (bcw)
July 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 30 Motion for Discovery. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 7/26/13. (bcw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Humphrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joseph Williams
Represented By: Brian S. Kammer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Carl Humphrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?