Jackson v. Franks et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth L. Jackson
Defendant: Phillips, John Doe and Douglas D. Franks
Case Number: 4:2012cv00291
Filed: November 20, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
County: Chatham
Presiding Judge: G. R. Smith
Presiding Judge: William T. Moore
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER ADOPTING re 14 Report and Recommendations dismissing this case without prejudice, dismissing as Moot 11 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 10/30/2013. (loh)
August 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS directing service by the USM on defendant Phillips and dismissing defendants Franks and Doe re 8 Amended Complaint filed by Kenneth L. Jackson, 1 Complaint filed by Kenneth L. Jackson. Objections to R&R due by 9/12/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 8/29/13. (bcw)
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDERED that the Court grant Plaintiff 30 days to amend re 1 Complaint filed by Kenneth L. Jackson. The Clerk is directed to send this Order to plaintiff's account custodian. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 12/19/12. (wwp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Franks et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas D. Franks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth L. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?