Hunter v. Abbott et al

Plaintiff: Michael P. Hunter
Defendant: Louisa Abbott, Jennifer Burns and Thomas Cerbone
Case Number: 4:2013cv00035
Filed: February 11, 2013
Court: Georgia Southern District Court
Office: Savannah Office
County: Chatham
Referring Judge: G. R. Smith
Presiding Judge: William T. Moore
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 22, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing all parties to be served re 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Michael P. Hunter. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 5/22/2013. (loh)
May 22, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 7 Motion to Rectify ; denying as moot 8 Motion to Rectify. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 5/22/2013. (loh)
June 21, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING re 9 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 6/21/2013. (loh)
April 11, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacating the 3 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directs Hunter to either pay the full $350.00 filing fee, or submit a new consent form. The Plaintiff's failure to do so within 21 days will result in the dismissal of the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 4/11/13. (wwp)
May 22, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS dismissing without prejudice re 1 Complaint filed by Michael P. Hunter. Objections to R&R due by 6/5/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 5/22/2013. (loh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunter v. Abbott et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael P. Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisa Abbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Cerbone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.