Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation v. Cobalt Partners, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Defendant: Cobalt Partners, LLC, Alberto Alvarez, Adam Beeler, Rodney M. Cook Jr., Allen C. Harper, William M. Tuttle, II and Charles K. Werk
Case Number: 4:2013cv00099
Filed: April 19, 2013
Court: Georgia Southern District Court
Office: Savannah Office
County: Chatham
Presiding Judge: B. Avant Edenfield
Referring Judge: G. R. Smith
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1391 Venue Generally
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 19, 2016 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND NOTICE OF PRETRIAL PROCEEDINGS, the parties shall file a consolidated proposed pretrial order by the close of business on June 3, 2016. (Pretrial Order due by 6/3/2016). Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 4/19/16. (cmr)
April 12, 2016 125 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 119 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 4/12/16. (cmr)
March 28, 2016 124 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 89 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 3/28/16. (cmr)
March 21, 2016 122 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Defendants Beeler and Cook to resubmit their declarations, in compliance with these requirements, not later that March 23, 2016. (Compliance due by 3/23/2016). Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 3/21/16. (cmr)
September 9, 2015 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 105 Motion to Substitute Party. CadleRock III, LLC added. CadleRock III, LLC terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 9/9/2015. (loh)
July 17, 2015 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to enter default on 88 Motion for Entry of Default. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 7/17/15. (cmr)
July 9, 2015 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER LIFTING STAY. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 7/9/15. (cmr)
March 13, 2015 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 58 Motion to Compel and for Preservation of Electronically-Stored Data Against Defendant Tuttle. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 3/13/2015. (loh)
October 27, 2014 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 65 Motion to Stay litigation. The Court stays the litigation for one hundred and twenty days. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 10/27/14. (wwp)
October 16, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 36 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge B. Avant Edenfield on 10/16/2013. (loh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation v. Cobalt Partners, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Carrie Helen Bacon
Represented By: Kathleen Horne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cobalt Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alberto Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Beeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney M. Cook Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen C. Harper
Represented By: F. Skip Sugarman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William M. Tuttle, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles K. Werk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?