Shipman v. Marlo Enterprises, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Cheree Shipman
Defendant: Marlo Enterprises, Inc. and Martin Reed
Case Number: 4:2014cv00052
Filed: March 14, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
County: Chatham
Presiding Judge: G. R. Smith
Presiding Judge: William T. Moore
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered Granting Plaintiff's Third Motion for Default Judgment. (loh)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDERED that Plaintiff is DIRECTED to demonstrate, within ten days from the date of this order, why no further action has been taken in this case. Failure to do so will result in dismissal without prejudice. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 8/30/17. (loh)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER denying 25 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 3/7/17. (wwp)
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER dismissing as moot 18 Motion for Default Judgment. The Clerk's entries of default as to Defendants Marlo re 11 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT and Reed re 17 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT are VACTATED. Plaintiff is Ordered to re-serve re 15 Amended Complaint at the correct address. Plaintiff may seek a Clerk's entry of default and default judgment. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 4/18/2016. (loh)
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER dismissing as moot 9 Motion to Dismiss. The Court grants 12 Plaintiff's request to file an amended complaint. Plaintiff shall have 14 days from the date of this order to file her amended complaint. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 2/9/15. (wwp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shipman v. Marlo Enterprises, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheree Shipman
Represented By: Craig J. Ehrlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marlo Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?