Days v. Stonebridge Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Jeannette H. Days
Defendant: Stonebridge Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2014cv00214
Filed: September 26, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
County: Chatham
Presiding Judge: G. R. Smith
Presiding Judge: William T. Moore
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered Granting Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment Dismissing Plaintiff's Claims. (loh)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting 30 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff shall have fourteen days to submit an amended complaint correcting deficiencies identified in this order. Failure to submit an amended complaint will result in dismissal of this case. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 6/29/17. (jrb)
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER dismissing Plaintiff's claim for bad faith failure to pay. (Compliance due by 12/21/2016.) Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 11/21/16. (wwp)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER deferring ruling on 6 Motion to Dismiss; denying 7 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 9/14/15. (bcw)
September 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2 GENERAL ORDER: Report of Rule 26(f) planning meeting. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 9/26/2014. (loh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Days v. Stonebridge Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeannette H. Days
Represented By: Lester B. Johnson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stonebridge Life Insurance Company
Represented By: H. Sanders Carter, Jr.
Represented By: Andrea Kuntzman Cataland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?