LM Insurance Corporation v. Roof Crafters, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: LM Insurance Corporation
Defendant: Roof Crafters, Inc. and David Owens
Case Number: 4:2015cv00116
Filed: May 4, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
County: Chatham
Presiding Judge: G. R. Smith
Presiding Judge: Lisa G. Wood
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER administratively closing the 1 Complaint filed by LM Insurance Corporation, ( Compliance due by 2/20/2017.) Signed by Chief Judge Lisa G. Wood on 12/22/16. (wwp)
April 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDERED that in the future, to prevent any such errors from interfering with the speedy resolution of this case, counsel should file on the docket anything that implicitly or explicitly seeks Court action. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 4/27/16. (wwp)
April 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 The Court ORDERS the parties to, within seven days of the date this Order is served, comply (finally) with the Courts previous extension 45 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, and submit a proposed scheduling order. That proposal will use January 1, 2016 as discoverys commencement and calculate remaining deadlines accordingly. ( Compliance due by 4/22/2016.) Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 4/14/16. (wwp)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting 23 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting 24 Motion for Joinder; granting 27 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 10/30/15. (bcw)
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 GENERAL ORDER: Report of Rule 26(f) planning meeting. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 5/4/2015. (loh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LM Insurance Corporation v. Roof Crafters, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LM Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Scott J. Crosby
Represented By: Sarah H. Lamar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roof Crafters, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?