Holsey v. United States Of America
Petitioner: Michael Eugene Holsey
Respondent: United States Of America
Case Number: 4:2015cv00198
Filed: July 10, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
County: Chatham
Presiding Judge: G. R. Smith
Presiding Judge: William T. Moore
Nature of Suit: Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 JUDGMENT entered pursuant to 10 Order. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 11/20/17. (jlm)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS denying 1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Michael Eugene Holsey. Objections to R&R due by 11/2/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 10/16/17. (jlm)
July 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to refer this case to The Honorable James E. Graham. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 7/20/2015. (loh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holsey v. United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Eugene Holsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Of America
Represented By: R. Brian Tanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?