Peek v. United States Of America
Defendant: United States Of America
Petitioner: Anthony Reginald Peek
Case Number: 4:2015cv00218
Filed: August 10, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
County: Chatham
Presiding Judge: G. R. Smith
Presiding Judge: William T. Moore
Nature of Suit: Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER directing the clerk to place a copy of this order in this case and to administratively close case CV416-215. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 1/6/17. (Copy mailed to Anthony Peek #14156-021, F.C.I., 2680 U.S. Hwy 301 South, Jesup, GA 31599. (jlm)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER adopting re 6 Report and Recommendations and denying the 2255 Motion to Vacate. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 2/8/16. (bcw)
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing all parties to be served re 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 5 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Anthony Reginald Peek. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 12/21/2015. (loh)
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing all parties to be served re 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Anthony Reginald Peek. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 11/30/2015. (loh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peek v. United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anthony Reginald Peek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Of America
Represented By: R. Brian Tanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?