Deason v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company et al
Plaintiff: John Deason
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Cleco Corporation, Dwayne Gibson and Lucius Bobbit
Case Number: 4:2015cv00220
Filed: August 11, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
County: Chatham
Presiding Judge: G. R. Smith
Presiding Judge: William T. Moore
Nature of Suit: Federal Employers Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 12/15/16. (wwp)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting 56 Motion to Stay discovery and all related deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 9/21/16. (wwp)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER dismissing as moot 19 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; dismissing as moot 30 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 5/25/2016. (loh)
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting 44 Motion to Amend Complaint and Extend Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 5/23/2016. (loh)
October 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting 23 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hav vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 10/13/2015. (loh)
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting 11 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice; granting 12 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 9/1/2015. (loh)
August 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 GENERAL ORDER: Report of Rule 26(f) planning meeting. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 8/11/2015. (loh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deason v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Deason
Represented By: Roy Robinson Kelly, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Represented By: J. Ellsworth Hall, IV
Represented By: Amanda M. Morris
Represented By: Mark E. Toth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleco Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwayne Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucius Bobbit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?