Diligence Maritime, LTD v. Agribusiness United Savannah Logisticts, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Diligence Maritime, LTD
Defendant: Agribusiness United Savannah Logistics, LLC, Agribusiness Multi-Modal Commodities, Inc, Agribusiness United North America, Inc, Agribusiness United DMCC and Agribusiness United Afrique S.A.R.LAU
Case Number: 4:2015cv00225
Filed: August 18, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
County: Chatham
Presiding Judge: G. R. Smith
Presiding Judge: Lisa G. Wood
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 23 Motion to Stay the case. ORDERED that the Clerk shall ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this case without prejudice to the right of any party with standing to reopen it. See, e.g., In re Heritage Southwest Medical Group PA, 464 F. App'x 285, 287 (5th Cir. 2012) ("administrative closure does not have any effect on the rights of the parties and is simply a docket-management device."). Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 11/5/15. (wwp) (loh).
September 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting 17 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice; granting 18 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice; granting 19 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 9/28/2015. (loh)
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting 5 Motion for Appointment of Special Process Server. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 8/31/2015. (loh)
August 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting 6 Motion for Leave to Appear for hac vice for attorney Ryan Gilsenan. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 8/19/15. (wwp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diligence Maritime, LTD v. Agribusiness United Savannah Logisticts, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diligence Maritime, LTD
Represented By: Vonnetta L. Benjamin
Represented By: Ryan D. Gilsenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agribusiness United Savannah Logistics, LLC
Represented By: Mark H. Glidewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agribusiness Multi-Modal Commodities, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agribusiness United North America, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agribusiness United DMCC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agribusiness United Afrique S.A.R.LAU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?