Orr v. United States of America
Petitioner: Michael Orr
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 4:2015cv00300
Filed: November 12, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
County: Chatham
Presiding Judge: G. R. Smith
Presiding Judge: William T. Moore
Nature of Suit: Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER ADOPTING 9 Report and Recommendations dismissing as moot the motion to amend. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 12/30/16. (wwp)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS dismissing as moot the 8 MOTION to amend the 1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Michael Orr. Objections to R&R due by 10/11/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 9/27/16. (wwp)
December 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ADOPTING the 2 Report and Recommendations denying the 2255 petition. The Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 12/28/15. (wwp)
November 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing all parties to be served re 2 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Michael Orr. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 11/18/2015. (loh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orr v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Orr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: R. Brian Tanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?