United States of America v. Rouse et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Thomas M. Rouse, Wallace L. Rouse, Jr., Georgia Department of Revenue, Chatham County Tax Commissioner and Mac Papers, Inc.
Cross_claimant: Georgia Department of Revenue
Cross_defendant: Thomas M. Rouse
Case Number: 4:2016cv00006
Filed: January 7, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
County: Chatham
Presiding Judge: J. Randal Hall
Presiding Judge: G. R. Smith
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7402
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER DISMISSING WITH PREJUDICE Plaintiff's claims against Defendants and Defendant Georgia Department of Revenue's crossclaim against Defendant Thomas M. Rouse. The Clerk is directed to terminate all motions and deadlines and close this case. Each party shall bear its own costs. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 07/21/2016. (thb)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting 19 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b); granting 19 Motion to Stay. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendant Thomas Rouse as to count one of the complaint in the total amount of $107,436.54 plus statutory additions and interest that continue to accrue under 26 U.S.C. §§6621-6622. The Court stays this case until January 20, 2017. The Court orders the parties to file a joint status report every ninety (90) days to update the Court on any progress regarding the property's sales. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 04/21/2016. (thb)
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 GENERAL ORDER: Report of Rule 26(f) planning. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 1/7/2016. (loh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Rouse et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kindra Baer
Represented By: Nicholas Scott Bahnsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas M. Rouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wallace L. Rouse, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Department of Revenue
Represented By: Susan L. Rutherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chatham County Tax Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mac Papers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Georgia Department of Revenue
Represented By: Susan L. Rutherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Thomas M. Rouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?