Monsegue, Sr. v. United States of America
Petitioner: Frank D. Monsegue, Sr.
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 4:2016cv00021
Filed: January 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
County: Chatham
Presiding Judge: G. R. Smith
Presiding Judge: William T. Moore
Nature of Suit: Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER that the 76 USCA Mandate is made the order of this court. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 10/15/20. (wwp)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDERED that the 72 USCA Mandate is made the order of this Court. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 1/31/20. (wwp) Modified on 2/4/2020 (wwp).
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDERED that the 70 USCA Mandate of the United States Court of Appeals for the 11th Circuit is made the order of this Court. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 12/19/19. (wwp)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER denying 64 Motion for Leave to Appeal. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 10/17/19. (wwp)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER denying Monsegue Motion in Criminal case CR414-19 to disband the Supreme Court and the United States Justice System. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham. (wwp) Modified on 7/24/2019 (wwp).
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER ADOPTING 50 Report and Recommendations denying the motion to amend reopen 28 U.S.C 2255. Petition is not entitled to a certificate of appealability. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 7/23/19. (wwp)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER denying 49 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Frank D. Monsegue, Sr. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS dismissing the successive 2255 re 1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Frank D. Monsegue, Sr. (Objections to R&R due by 7/17/2019). Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 7/3/19. (wwp) Modified on 7/3/2019 (wwp).
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER denying 33 Motion for reopening the time to file an appeal. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 10/18/18. (wwp)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying as moot 28 Motion to Appoint Counsel; denying as moot 29 Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 10/18/17. (wwp) Modified on 10/18/2017 (wwp).
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CLERK'S JUDGMENT denying the 2255 petition. (wwp)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS denying 11 MOTION for Default Judgment, 1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) 12 MOTION, 5 MOTION filed by Frank D. Monsegue, Sr. Objections to R&R due by 4/7/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 3/24/17. (jlm)
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying 9 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 2/1/17. (jlm)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDERED that the Court directs respondent to file an answer or response within thirty days from the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 1/26/2016. (loh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monsegue, Sr. v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Frank D. Monsegue, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Theodore S. Hertzberg
Represented By: R. Brian Tanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?