Settle v. Winnebago Industries, Inc.
Plaintiff: Walter Curtis Settle
Defendant: Winnebago Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2016cv00106
Filed: May 9, 2016
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
County: Chatham
Presiding Judge: G. R. Smith
Presiding Judge: William T. Moore
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER dismissing as moot 18 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 3/13/17. (wwp)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting 12 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice for attorney Zachary Meeks. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 8/17/16. (wwp)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting 6 Motion for Leave to Appear for attorney Mark Lefkow. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 6/6/16. (wwp)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2 GENERAL ORDER: Report of Rule 26(f) planning meeting. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 5/10/2016. (loh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Settle v. Winnebago Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Curtis Settle
Represented By: Craig J. Ehrlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winnebago Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Tina Cheng
Represented By: Mark D. Lefkow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?