CSX Transportation, Inc v. Kirkland et al
Plaintiff: CSX Transportation, Inc
Defendant: James Michael Kirkland, Transportation Inc Agent Group, Inc, Hudson Insurance Company and New Hamphire Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2016cv00117
Filed: May 23, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
County: Chatham
Presiding Judge: G. R. Smith
Presiding Judge: William T. Moore
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting 57 Motion to Withdraw the Admissions, Denying 58 MOTION to Strike 41 Expert Witness Report, 38 Expert Witness Report and Exclude Expert Testimony. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 5/24/17. (jrb)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER re 59 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by CSX Transportation, Inc. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant CDS Transport, Inc. are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE with each party to bear its own costs and attorney fees. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 3/22/17. (jlm)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER re 42 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by CSX Transportation, Inc. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Hudson Insurance Company are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 12/20/16. (jlm)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting 21 Motion for Leave to Appear for attorney Jeffrey Cohen. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 7/26/16. (wwp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CSX Transportation, Inc v. Kirkland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CSX Transportation, Inc
Represented By: J. Curt Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Michael Kirkland
Represented By: Brantley Cole Rowlen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transportation Inc Agent Group, Inc
Represented By: Morton G. Forbes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hudson Insurance Company
Represented By: R. Scott Masterson
Represented By: Brantley Cole Rowlen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Hamphire Insurance Company
Represented By: Morton G. Forbes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?