Ubele v. United States Of America
Petitioner: Donald Lee Ubele
Respondent: United States Of America
Case Number: 4:2016cv00143
Filed: June 10, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
County: Chatham
Presiding Judge: G. R. Smith
Presiding Judge: William T. Moore
Nature of Suit: Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying 19 Motion to Correct re 15 Judgment; denying 22 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 8/29/17. (loh)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS dismissing 1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Donald Lee Ubele, and granting 10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by United States Of America. Objections to R&R due by 4/6/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 3/23/17. (jlm)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER vacating 3 Report and Recommendations and directing the Government to file a response within 30 days of the date this Order is served; denying as moot 8 Motion to Supplement; denying 7 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 1/18/17. (jlm)
June 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to immediately forward Petitioner's motion to the United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit. In addition, the United States Probation Office is DIRECTED to immediately forward a copy of the Petitioner's presentence investigation report to the Eleventh Circuit. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 6/20/2016. (loh)
June 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing all parties to be served re 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Donald Lee Ubele. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 6/13/2016. (loh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ubele v. United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Donald Lee Ubele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Of America
Represented By: R. Brian Tanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?