Reynolds v. United States of America
Petitioner: Cedric Reynolds
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 4:2016cv00194
Filed: July 7, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
County: Chatham
Presiding Judge: G. R. Smith
Presiding Judge: William T. Moore
Nature of Suit: Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER denying 39 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 5/11/20. (wwp)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER dismissing 35 Motion to Vacate; granting 36 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 2/20/20. (jrb)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER dismissing 23 Motion for Relief from Judgment Pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P. Rule 60(B). Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 7/18/19. (jrb)
December 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CLERK'S JUDGMENT dismissing Petitioner's 28 U.S.C. 2255 motion. (wwp)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing the Clerk to submit the 7 Report and Recommendations with any objections to the Honorable William T. Moore, Jr on 10/4/16. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 9/19/16. (wwp)
July 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing the Clerk to serve the United States Attorney with 1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Cedric Reynolds and Order dated 7/8/16. ( Compliance due by 8/7/2016.) Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 7/8/16. (wwp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reynolds v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Cedric Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Jennifer Gayle Solari
Represented By: R. Brian Tanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?