United States of America v. Cochran

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Regina A. Cochran
Case Number: 4:2016cv00212
Filed: July 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
County: Chatham
Presiding Judge: G. R. Smith
Presiding Judge: William T. Moore
Nature of Suit: Recovery of Overpayment and Enforcement of Judgment
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER approving and adopting the 12 Settlement Agreement filed by United States of America. The Court declines to retain jurisdiction of this matter in order to enforce the terms of the Settlement Agreement and Consent Judgment. The Clerk is directed to enter final Judgment in accordance with the terms of the parties' proposed Consent Judgment with the noted exception. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 1/9/17. (wwp)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting 10 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 12/20/16. (wwp)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 GENERAL ORDER: Report of Rule 26(f) planning meeting. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 7/29/2016. (loh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: SaMee Harden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regina A. Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?