Oceanconnect Marine, Inc v. M/V Seaspan Efficiency
Plaintiff: Oceanconnect Marine, Inc
Defendant: M/V Seaspan Efficiency
Case Number: 4:2016cv00236
Filed: September 6, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
County: Chatham
Presiding Judge: G. R. Smith
Presiding Judge: William T. Moore
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 11/21/16. (wwp)
October 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER directing the parties to inform the Court no later than 15 days from the date of this Order whether they object to the Court vacating the warrant of arrest in rem. ( Discovery due by 11/10/2016.) Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 10/26/16. (wwp)
September 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting 7 Motion for Leave to Appear. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 9/8/16. (wwp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oceanconnect Marine, Inc v. M/V Seaspan Efficiency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oceanconnect Marine, Inc
Represented By: Thomas Langston Bass, Jr.
Represented By: J. Stephen Simms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V Seaspan Efficiency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?