Securities and Exchange Commission v. Medient Studios, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Medient Studios, Inc., Fonu2, Inc, Manu Kumaran, Joel A. Shapiro and Roger Miguel
Case Number: 4:2016cv00253
Filed: September 23, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
County: Effingham
Presiding Judge: G. R. Smith
Presiding Judge: William T. Moore
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 DEFAULT JUDGMENT against Manu Kumaran. Signed by Deputy Clerk on November 17, 2020. (jrb)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER DIRECTING Plaintiff to provide an update to the Court within 10 days from the date of this order on the status of this case. (Compliance due by 10/17/2020). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 10/7/20. (wwp)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDERED that Plaintiff is DIRECTED to provide an update to the Court within ten days from the date of this order on the status of this case. If defendant has been served as directed, but has failed to appear within the prescribed time, Plaintiff is also DIRECTED to SHOW CAUSE why this case should not be dismissed for Plaintiffs failure to prosecute. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 1/16/20. (loh)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Securities and Exchange Commission against Medient Studios, Inc. re 51 Order. (loh)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 FINAL JUDGMENT as to Defendant Joel A. Shapiro. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 1/17/18. (jrb)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER of Permanent Injunction, Officer and Director Bar, and Penny Stock Bar as to Defendant Roger Miguel. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 11/27/17. (loh)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting 39 Motion to Stay re 37 Order on Motion to Stay, Seeking Extension of Stay. The current stay of proceedings in this matter as to Defendant Joel A. "Jake" Shapiro is extended for 30 additional days. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 11/15/17. (loh) Modified on 11/15/2017 (loh).
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting 36 Motion to Stay. It is ORDERED that proceedings in the matter are stayed as to Defendant Joel A. "Jake" Shapiro for sixty days pending resolution of the settlement reached between the parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 9/13/17. (loh)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER MEMORIALIZING PARTIES' AGREEMENT REGARDING INADVERTENT PRODUCTION OF PRIVILEGED DOCUMENTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 2/6/17. (jlm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Medient Studios, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: William S. Murnahan
Represented By: Shannon Heath Statkus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medient Studios, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fonu2, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manu Kumaran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel A. Shapiro
Represented By: Harry D. Dixon, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Miguel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?