United States of America ex rel. Jolie Johnson and Debbie Helmly et al v. Bethany Hospice of Coastal Georgia, LLC et al
Case Number: 4:2016cv00290
Filed: November 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
Presiding Judge: William T. Moore
Presiding Judge: G. R. Smith
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729 False Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 143 AMENDED JUDGMENT dismissing case with prejudice. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr. on 3/31/20. (jrb)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER dismissing as moot 52 Motion to Dismiss Second amended complaint. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 9/9/19. (wwp)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER dismissing with prejudice Bethany Hospice and Palliative Care of Coastal Georgia, LLC re 125 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Bethany Hospice and Palliative Care of Coastal Georgia, LLC. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 7/29/19. (wwp)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER dismissing without prejudice the following Defendants from this action: Thomas Miller, MD, St. Josephs Candler Health System, Inc., Joenie Almeida, M.D., Brian Anderson, M.D., Memorial Health, Inc., Memorial Health University Medical Center, I nc., Provident Health Services, Inc., MPPG, In., Memorial Health University Physicians, LLC, Community Hospice Holdings, LLC, Southern Community Hospice Care, Inc., Southern Community Hospice Care, Inc., Vicki Ryles, Royce Ryles, Jason Colbert, James L. Ray, M.D., Patrick Byrne, M.D., Misty Poole, M.D., Hospice Savannah, Inc., The Steward Center for Palliative Care Inc., Hospice Savannah Foundation, Inc., Monica Anderson, Bruce Barragan, Chad Carnell, Kelly Erola, M.D., Laura Farless, M.D., Mart in Greenberg, M.D., Debra Anthony Larson, Appling Healthcare System, Inc., Comfort Care Hospice, LLC, Ray Leadbetter, Angie Potts, Errol Graham, M.D., Southcoast Health System, Southcoast Medical Associates, LLC, Southcoast Medical Group, LLC, Theodore Geffen, M.D., Thomas Moriarity, M.D. PruittHealth, Inc., Pruitt Health Hospice, Inc., Neil Pruitt, Jr. re 34 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Jolie Johnson, Debbie Helmly. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 7/25/19. (wwp)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 124 Clerk's Extension ORDER granting 123 Motion to reply to 121 RESPONSE to 100 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 7/19/19. (wwp)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER dismissing as moot 103 Motion to Continue; granting 117 Motion to continue partial stay of discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 7/11/19. (wwp)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER terminating 99 Motion to transfer the case to the Statesboro Division. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 7/3/19. (wwp)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting 95 Joint Limited scheduling and discovery Motion. New discovery related to the retaliation claims may be served on or after June 3, 2019. Fact discovery cut-off date is December 15, 2019. Expert discovery period to begin on Dec ember 18, 2019. Deadline to disclose affirmative experts and exchange expert reports is December 18, 2019. Deadline to depose affirmative experts is January 31, 2020. Deadline to disclose rebuttal experts is February 27, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 5/13/19. (wwp)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting 83 Motion to modify the Court's Order staying the case. The parties are ORDERED to meet and confer within 14 days of service of this Order to discuss a proposed, limited Scheduling Order to proceed with fact discovery on relators retaliation claim. The parties are further ORDERED to file their joint, limited Scheduling Order within 21 days of service of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 5/2/19. (wwp)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting 54 Motion to Stay discovery; denying as moot 55 Motion for Protective Order and denying as moot 73 MOTION for reconsideration of the Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 3/22/19. (wwp)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER dismissing as moot 20 Motion to Dismiss; dismissing as moot 28 Motion to Stay; dismissing as moot 29 Motion to Amend/Correct; adopting in part 50 Report and Recommendations that dismissing motions 20, 28, and 29. The court construes the Relators' 73 Objections as a motion for reconsideration of the scheduling order. Defendants shall be given 14 days to respond to the Relators' objections. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 3/18/19. (wwp)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER temporarily staying discovery for 30 days. (Compliance due by 3/24/2019). Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 2/22/19. (wwp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America ex rel. Jolie Johnson and Debbie Helmly et al v. Bethany Hospice of Coastal Georgia, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?