The Ford Plantation Club, Inc. et al v. Scott et al
Plaintiff: The Ford Plantation Club, Inc. and The Ford Plantation Association, Inc.
Defendant: Michael L. Scott and Nancy J. Scott
Counter_claimant: Nancy J. Scott and Michael L. Scott
Counter_defendant: The Ford Plantation Association, Inc. and The Ford Plantation Club, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2016cv00309
Filed: November 15, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
County: Chatham
Presiding Judge: G. R. Smith
Presiding Judge: William T. Moore
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER hereby renders in favor of Plaintiff Ford Plantation Club, Inc. and against Defendants in the amount of $214,704.60, which represents $176,360.25 in principal, $23,950.98 in interest, $13,860.00 in attorney fees, and $5 33.37 in costs and expenses; and in favor of Plaintiff Ford Plantation Association, Inc. and against Defendants in the amount of $36,363.40, which represents $18,325.00 in principal,$1,940.00 in assessments, $125.00 in service fee s, $2,750.59 in interest, $12,700.00 in attorney fees, and $522.81 in costs and expenses. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to enter judgment consistent with this order and close this case. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 06/04/2018. (evs)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 CONSENT PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 10/06/17. (jlm)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting 6 Motion to dismiss. As a result, Defendants' counterclaim for deceit is DISMISSED. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 9/22/17. (jlm)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER denying 17 Motion to Compel; granting 18 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 5/10/17. (jlm)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2 GENERAL ORDER: Report of Rule 26(f) planning meeting. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 11/15/16. (loh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Ford Plantation Club, Inc. et al v. Scott et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Ford Plantation Club, Inc.
Represented By: Margaret K. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Ford Plantation Association, Inc.
Represented By: Margaret K. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael L. Scott
Represented By: Joseph H. Barrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy J. Scott
Represented By: Joseph H. Barrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Nancy J. Scott
Represented By: Joseph H. Barrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Michael L. Scott
Represented By: Joseph H. Barrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: The Ford Plantation Association, Inc.
Represented By: Margaret K. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: The Ford Plantation Club, Inc.
Represented By: Margaret K. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?