Arenas v. Georgia Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Maria Arenas
Defendant: Georgia Department of Corrections, Georgia Correctional Health Care, Mark Shelby, Stanley Williams and Marvin Dickson
Case Number: 4:2016cv00320
Filed: November 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
County: Liberty
Presiding Judge: G. R. Smith
Presiding Judge: William T. Moore
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER making the mandate of the USCA, the order of this court - re 140 USCA Mandate. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 12/21/20. (cmr)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER granting 95 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and dismissing in part 96 Motion for Summary Judgment; dismissing as moot 98 Motion ; dismissing as moot 99 Motion ; dismissing as moot 100 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 4/13/20. (wwp)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER denying 65 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 9/19/19. (wwp)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER denying 85 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 4/11/19. (jrb)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER denying 76 Motion to Compel without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 1/23/19. (wwp)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 53 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Williams under 42 U.S.C. 1983, Defendants' motion is granted. Plaintiff claims for deliberate indifference against Defendant Williams based on having a policy of deliberate indifference to the medical needs of inmates and failing to train his staff are dismissed. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 2/20/18. (wwp)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER finding as moot 36 Motion to Dismiss; granting 49 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 6/12/17. (wwp)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER denying as moot 21 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 3/2/17. (wwp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arenas v. Georgia Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Arenas
Represented By: Brent Cason Carter
Represented By: Jeff Edwards
Represented By: Scott Medlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Department of Corrections
Represented By: Angela Ellen Cusimano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Correctional Health Care
Represented By: Angela Ellen Cusimano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Shelby
Represented By: Angela Ellen Cusimano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Williams
Represented By: Angela Ellen Cusimano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin Dickson
Represented By: Angela Ellen Cusimano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?