Gordon v. United States of America
Defendant: United States of America
Petitioner: Maurice Anthony Gordon
Case Number: 4:2017cv00020
Filed: February 1, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
County: Chatham
Presiding Judge: G. R. Smith
Presiding Judge: William T. Moore
Nature of Suit: Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER ADOPTING the 7 Report and Recommendations, granting 6 Motion to Dismiss filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 5/30/17. (wwp)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS dismissing 1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Maurice Anthony Gordon, granting 6 MOTION to Dismiss Gordon's Successive 28 U.S.C. § 2255 Motion filed by United States of America. Objections to R&R due by 4/26/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 4/12/17. (wwp)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing the Clerk to serve the U.S. Attorney with this Order and a copy of the 1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Maurice Anthony Gordon. ( Compliance due by 3/4/2017.) Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 2/1/17. (wwp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gordon v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Maurice Anthony Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: R. Brian Tanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?