Azmat v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Petitioner: Najam Azmat
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 4:2017cv00086
Filed: May 15, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
County: Chatham
Presiding Judge: G. R. Smith
Presiding Judge: William T. Moore
Nature of Suit: Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDERED that the 134 USCA Mandate Judgment of the United States Court of Appeals is made the judgment of this Court. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 1/17/23. (wwp)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER denying as moot Petitioner's 126 Motion for Reconsideration 125 Order. Petitioner's request for the Court to re-review the record and find/verify that Dr. Azmat's indictment was fraudulently obtained and order the U.S. Attorney to respond to claims of improper conduct by assistant U.S. Attorneys is denied. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 1/10/2022. (ca) Modified on 1/10/2022 (thb).
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDERED that Petitioner is not entitled to a Certificate of Appealability re 110 USCA Case Number. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 1/7/21. (wwp)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDERED that the Order of the United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit is made the Order of this Court. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 5/18/2020. (loh)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER denying 80 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 11/13/19. (jrb)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER dismissing as moot 71 Motion to Correct Clerical Error, filed by Najam Azmat. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 10/2/19. (loh)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 JUDGMENT dismissing Petitioner's Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 8/12/19. (jrb)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER AFFIRMING 56 Magistrate Judge's Order; and DENYING 59 Motion to Stay All Proceedings Related to 57 Report and Recommendations, 60 Motion to Stay All Proceedings Before the District Court as to Najam Azmat. Petitioner will have 14 days from the date of this order to file any objections. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 07/18/2019. (evk)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge James E. Graham for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 01/14/2019. (evk)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER construing 11 as a motion to amend the 28 USC 2255 Motion; denying as moot 12 Motion to Strike ; granting 19 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, Attorney William Mallory Kent terminated; denying as moot 21 Motion to Stay. Any oppositio n to that motion 18 shall be filed within 14 days of service of this Order in accordance with this Courts Local Rules. If unopposed, any motion to dismiss the amended § 2255 motion shall be filed within 30 days of service of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 11/21/17. (jrb) Modified on 11/21/2017 (jrb).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Azmat v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Najam Azmat
Represented By: William Mallory Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: James Christian Stuchell
Represented By: R. Brian Tanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?