Cummings v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Stephen Cummings
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 4:2018cv00002
Filed: January 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
County: Bryan
Presiding Judge: G. R. Smith
Presiding Judge: William T. Moore
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER APPROVING re 12 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Stephen Cummings. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to close this case. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 8/20/18. (loh)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting re 10 Motion to Stay Pending Mediation. It is ORDERED that proceedings in the above-styled action shall be and are hereby STAYED through and including August 13, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 7/16/18. (loh)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting re 8 Joint Motion to Modify Consent Order. Proceedings in this action shall and are hereby STAYED through and including July 9, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 3/20/18. (loh)
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting re 6 Motion to Stay Pending Mediation. The parties are ORDERED to notify the Court in writing as to whether a settlement is reached within five business days following the mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 3/13/18. (loh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cummings v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Cummings
Represented By: Heather K. Karrh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?