American Family Insurance Company v. DIA SURI, LLC
Plaintiff: American Family Insurance Company
Defendant: DIA SURI, LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv00181
Filed: July 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
County: Chatham
Presiding Judge: William T Moore
Referring Judge: G R Smith
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2018 Filing 10 Litigants' Bill of Rights by American Family Insurance Company. (Glickauf, Stephanie)
August 14, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: DIA SURI, LLC answer due 10/8/2018. (wwp)
August 13, 2018 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by American Family Insurance Company. DIA SURI, LLC waiver sent on 8/9/2018, answer due 10/8/2018. (Glickauf, Stephanie) Modified on 8/14/2018 (wwp).
August 8, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to DIA SURI, LLC. (wwp)
August 8, 2018 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against DIA SURI, LLC, filed by American Family Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy, #2 Exhibit Summons)(Glickauf, Stephanie)
August 7, 2018 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Family Insurance Company identifying American Family Insurance Mutual Holding Company as Corporate Parent.. (Glickauf, Stephanie)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing Plaintiff to file an amended complaint within 14 days from the date of this Order. (Amended complaint due by 8/16/2018). Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 8/2/18. (wwp)
July 31, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to DIA SURI, LLC. (jrb)
July 31, 2018 Filing fee: $400.00, receipt number 113J-2421011. (jrb)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 GENERAL ORDER: Report of Rule 26(f) planning meeting. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 7/31/18. (Attachments: #1 Litigants' Bill of Rights) (jrb)
July 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DIA SURI, LLC, filed by American Family Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Policy, #3 Registration)(jrb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Family Insurance Company v. DIA SURI, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIA SURI, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Family Insurance Company
Represented By: Stephanie F. Glickauf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?