Mack v. Department of Veteran's Affairs et al
Plaintiff: Kristin-Elizabeth Mack
Defendant: Tammy Kennedy and Department of Veteran's Affairs
Case Number: 4:2018cv00204
Filed: August 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: James E Graham
2 Judge: G R Smith
3 Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2018 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge James E. Graham. Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith no longer assigned to the case. (wwp)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing the Plaintiff to pay her filing fee or move to proceed IFP within 14 days of the date this order is served. ( Compliance due by 10/15/2018.) Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 9/28/18. (jrb)
September 14, 2018 Filing 4 RESPONSE to #2 Notice of filing fee deficiency filed by Kristin-Elizabeth Mack. (jrb)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge R. Stan Baker for all further proceedings. Judge Lisa G. Wood no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 9/4/18. (jrb)
August 28, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 9/18/2018. (jrb)
August 28, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Fee Deficiency re #1 Complaint. (jrb)
August 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Notice of Tort Claim) against Department of Veteran's Affairs and Tammy Kennedy, filed by Kristin-Elizabeth Mack.(jrb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/29/2018: #1 Corrected image) (jrb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mack v. Department of Veteran's Affairs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Veteran's Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristin-Elizabeth Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?