The Cincinnati Specialty Underwriters Insurance Company v. J&T's Warehouse, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: The Cincinnati Specialty Underwriters Insurance Company
Defendant: Jane Doe, J&T's Warehouse, Inc. and River Street Restaurant Group, LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv00205
Filed: August 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
Presiding Judge: James E Graham
Referring Judge: William T Moore
2 Judge: G R Smith
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 11/16/2018. Discovery due by 2/4/2019. Motions due by 3/6/2019. Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 12/3/2018. Expert Witness Report (defendant) due by 1/2/2019. Status Report due by 12/16/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 10/17/18. (Attachments: #1 Civil Trial Information, #2 Joint Status Instructions) (trb)
October 12, 2018 Filing 22 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Boyer, Matthew)
October 3, 2018 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge James E. Graham. Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith no longer assigned to the case. (wwp)
October 2, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by James D. Durham on behalf of Jane Doe (Durham, James)
September 25, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Zemany on behalf of J&T's Warehouse, Inc., River Street Restaurant Group, LLC (Zemany, Andrew)
September 20, 2018 Filing 19 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by J&T's Warehouse, Inc., River Street Restaurant Group, LLC. (Tate, Mark)
September 20, 2018 Filing 18 Litigants' Bill of Rights by J&T's Warehouse, Inc.. (Tate, Mark)
September 20, 2018 Filing 17 Litigants' Bill of Rights by River Street Restaurant Group, LLC. (Tate, Mark)
September 20, 2018 Filing 16 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by The Cincinnati Specialty Underwriters Insurance Company. (Boyer, Matthew)
September 19, 2018 Filing 15 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Jane Doe. (Savage, Brent)
September 17, 2018 Filing 14 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by J&T's Warehouse, Inc..(Tate, Mark)
September 17, 2018 Filing 13 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by River Street Restaurant Group, LLC.(Tate, Mark)
September 10, 2018 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Jane Doe. (Savage, Brent)
September 10, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Jane Doe.(Savage, Brent)
September 6, 2018 Filing 10 Litigants' Bill of Rights by The Cincinnati Specialty Underwriters Insurance Company. (Boyer, Matthew)
September 5, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Tina Cheng on behalf of The Cincinnati Specialty Underwriters Insurance Company (Cheng, Tina)
September 4, 2018 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jane Doe, J&T's Warehouse, Inc., River Street Restaurant Group, LLC, filed by The Cincinnati Specialty Underwriters Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certified Copy of CSU Policy, #2 Exhibit 2 - First Amended and Recast Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Reservation of Rights Letter to J&T'S Warehouse, Inc.)(Boyer, Matthew)
September 4, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Cincinnati Specialty Underwriters Insurance Company. Jane Doe served on 8/30/2018, answer due 9/20/2018. (Boyer, Matthew)
September 4, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Cincinnati Specialty Underwriters Insurance Company. River Street Restaurant Group, LLC served on 8/30/2018, answer due 9/20/2018. (Boyer, Matthew)
September 4, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Cincinnati Specialty Underwriters Insurance Company. J&T's Warehouse, Inc. served on 8/30/2018, answer due 9/20/2018. (Boyer, Matthew)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that the Plaintiff is directed to file an amended complaint within fourteen days from the date of this order listing all members of Defendant River Street Restaurant Group, LLC and their citizenship (Amended Complaint due by 9/13/2018.) Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 8/30/18. (jrb)
August 29, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Jane Doe, J&T's Warehouse, Inc., River Street Restaurant Group, LLC. (jrb)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 GENERAL ORDER: Report of Rule 26(f) planning meeting. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 8/29/18. (Attachments: #1 Litigants' Bill of Rights) (jrb)
August 28, 2018 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 113J-2437290. (jrb)
August 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jane Doe, J&T's Warehouse, Inc., and River Street Restaurant Group, LLC, filed by The Cincinnati Specialty Underwriters Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certified Copy of CSU Policy, #2 First Amended Complaint from State Court-Underlying Case, #3 Reservation of Rights Letter, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(jrb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Cincinnati Specialty Underwriters Insurance Company v. J&T's Warehouse, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Cincinnati Specialty Underwriters Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew Frantz Boyer
Represented By: Tina Cheng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Represented By: Brent J. Savage, Jr.
Represented By: James D. Durham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J&T's Warehouse, Inc.
Represented By: Mark A. Tate
Represented By: Andrew Zemany
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: River Street Restaurant Group, LLC
Represented By: Mark A. Tate
Represented By: Andrew Zemany
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?