U.S. Bank Trust N.A. v. Daniels, Sr. et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank Trust N.A.
Defendant: Larry Hugh Daniels, Sr., Chatham County, Georgia, Georgia Department of Revenue and Mary & Alice Family Limited Partnership, L.P.
Case Number: 4:2018cv00215
Filed: September 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
Presiding Judge: James E Graham
Referring Judge: William T Moore
2 Judge: G R Smith
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Stephen Ryan Starks for U.S. Bank Trust N.A. Attorney Paul G. Wersant terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 10/25/18. (jrb)
October 19, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #5 Consent MOTION to Substitute Attorney . (trb)
October 18, 2018 Filing 5 Consent MOTION to Substitute Attorney by U.S. Bank Trust N.A.. Responses due by 11/1/2018. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weatherly, Elizabeth)
October 3, 2018 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge James E. Graham. Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith no longer assigned to the case. (wwp)
October 3, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Chatham County, Georgia.(Hart, R.)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 GENERAL ORDER: Report of Rule 26(f) planning meeting. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 9/11/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (loh)
September 11, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Chatham County, Georgia, Larry Hugh Daniels, Sr., Georgia Department of Revenue, Mary & Alice Family Limited Partnership, L.P. (loh)
September 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by U.S. Bank Trust N.A. Receipt # 113J-2444446 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(loh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank Trust N.A. v. Daniels, Sr. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank Trust N.A.
Represented By: Paul G. Wersant
Represented By: Stephen Ryan Starks
Represented By: Elizabeth Blair Weatherly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Hugh Daniels, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chatham County, Georgia
Represented By: Jennifer R. Davenport
Represented By: R. Jonathan Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Department of Revenue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary & Alice Family Limited Partnership, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?