SEED Eco Lounge, LLC v. Alqahtani et al

Plaintiff: SEED Eco Lounge, LLC
Defendant: Meshari Alqahtani and SAMBA Financial Group
Case Number: 4:2018cv00217
Filed: September 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: James E Graham
Referring Judge: William T Moore
2 Judge: G R Smith
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: SAMBA Financial Group answer due 11/16/2018. (trb)
November 6, 2018 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint for SAMBA Financial Group served on Andrea Daley-Chappell on 10/26/2018, filed by SEED Eco Lounge, LLC. (Rahimi, Joseph)
October 23, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Meshari Alqahtani.(trb)
October 5, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Meshari Alqahtani answer due 10/23/2018. (trb)
October 3, 2018 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge James E. Graham. Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith no longer assigned to the case. (wwp)
October 3, 2018 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Meshari Alqahtani on 10/02/2018, filed by SEED Eco Lounge, LLC. (Rahimi, Joseph)
September 25, 2018 Filing 7 Litigants' Bill of Rights by SEED Eco Lounge, LLC. (Rahimi, Joseph)
September 18, 2018 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by SEED Eco Lounge, LLC. (Rahimi, Joseph)
September 18, 2018 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by SEED Eco Lounge, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit "A" to First Amended Complaint)(Rahimi, Joseph)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing Plaintiff to file an amended complaint within fourteen days from the date of this order listing all members of Plaintiff Seed Eco Lounge, LLC and their citizenships. (Amended Pleadings due by 10/1/2018.) Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr. on 9/17/18. (trb) Modified on 9/18/2018 (jlh).
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 GENERAL ORDER: Report of Rule 26(f) planning meeting. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 9/13/18. (Attachments: #1 Litigants' Bill of Rights) (trb)
September 13, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (trb)
September 12, 2018 Filing fee: $ 400.00, Receipt Number 113J-2446550. (trb)
September 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by SEED Eco Lounge, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(trb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SEED Eco Lounge, LLC v. Alqahtani et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEED Eco Lounge, LLC
Represented By: Joseph Y. Rahimi, II
Represented By: Taylor Dove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meshari Alqahtani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAMBA Financial Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?