Green v. Curtis V. Cooper Primary Health Center, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Albertha Green
Defendant: Curtis V. Cooper Primary Health Center, Inc. and Dr. Laquita Holt
Case Number: 4:2018cv00229
Filed: September 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
0 Judge: James E Graham
1 Judge: William T Moore
2 Judge: G R Smith
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2018 Motions No Longer Referred: #6 MOTION to Substitute Party. (evs)
October 3, 2018 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge James E. Graham. Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith no longer assigned to the case. (wwp)
October 1, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #6 MOTION to Substitute Party. (jrb)
October 1, 2018 Filing 7 RESPONSE to #3 Notice (Other) filed by Curtis V. Cooper Primary Health Center, Inc., Laquita Holt. (Leithart, Otto)
September 27, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Substitute Party by Curtis V. Cooper Primary Health Center, Inc., Laquita Holt. Responses due by 10/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A)(Leithart, Otto)
September 26, 2018 Filing 5 **ENTERED IN ERROR***(evs).
September 26, 2018 Filing 4 AMENDED DOCUMENT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Curtis V. Cooper Primary Health Center, Inc., Laquita Holt. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal, . (Attachments: #1 Exh. A - Chatham County Magistrate Court Record, #2 Exh. B - Declaration of Meredith Torres, #3 Exh. C - Certification of Employment)(Leithart, Otto) Modified on 9/27/2018 (evs).
September 25, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Curtis V. Cooper Primary Health Center, Inc. answer due 10/1/2018; Laquita Holt answer due 10/1/2018. (jrb)
September 25, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE to All Counsel of Record of Removal re #1 Notice of Removal. (jrb)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 GENERAL ORDER: Report of Rule 26(f) planning meeting. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 9/25/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Litigants' Bill of Rights) (jrb)
September 24, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Laquita Holt, Curtis V. Cooper Primary Health Center, Inc. from Magistrate Court of Chatham County, case number MGCV18-07574., filed by Laquita Holt, Curtis V. Cooper Primary Health Center, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Chatham County Magistrate Court Record with Defendants' Answer, #2 Declaration of Meredith Torres, #3 Certificate of Employment)(jrb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/25/2018: #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (jrb). Modified on 9/26/2018 (jrb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. Curtis V. Cooper Primary Health Center, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis V. Cooper Primary Health Center, Inc.
Represented By: Otto Woelke Leithart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Laquita Holt
Represented By: Otto Woelke Leithart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albertha Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?