Columbia National Insurance Company v. Dominguez et al

Plaintiff: Columbia National Insurance Company
Defendant: Cars Loading, LLC., Antonio Rosales, Silvia A. Rivera Dominguez, Mujahed Odeh and Esteban Rosales Romero
Case Number: 4:2018cv00256
Filed: November 5, 2018
Court: Georgia Southern District Court
Office: Savannah Office
0 Judge: James E Graham
1 Judge: William T Moore
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Cars Loading, LLC., Mujahed Odeh. (Branch, Kevin)
December 4, 2018 4 Defendants Cars Loading, LLC & Mujahed Odeh's ANSWER to Complaint for DJ and Rescission by Cars Loading, LLC., Mujahed Odeh.(Branch, Kevin)
November 6, 2018 3 Summons Issued as to Cars Loading, LLC., Mujahed Odeh, Esteban Rosales Romero. (jrb)
November 6, 2018 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 113J-2477177. (jrb)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order 2 GENERAL ORDER: Report of Rule 26(f) planning meeting. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 11/6/18. (Attachments: #1 Litigants' Bill of Rights) (jrb)
November 5, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Columbia National Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jrb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Columbia National Insurance Company v. Dominguez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cars Loading, LLC.
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio Rosales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silvia A. Rivera Dominguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mujahed Odeh
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esteban Rosales Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Columbia National Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard C. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?