Salas et al v. Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest
Plaintiff: Peter Salas and Margarita Salas
Defendant: Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest
Case Number: 4:2018cv00260
Filed: November 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: James E Graham
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest. (Cope, Joel)
December 28, 2018 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Cope, Joel)
December 28, 2018 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Peter Salas, Margarita Salas. (Vaughan, J.)
December 19, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Rule 26(f) Report & Disclosure Statement due by 12/28/2018. (loh)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting re #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Rule 26(f) Report and Disclosure Statement. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 12/19/18. (loh)
December 13, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Rule 26(f) Report and Disclosure Statement. (wwp)
December 13, 2018 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Rule 26(f) Report and Disclosure Statement by Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest. Responses due by 12/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Cope, Joel)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 11/28/18. (sff)
November 28, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey W. Melcher Receipt Number 113J-2490456, Fee Amount $200, by Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest. Responses due by 12/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cope, Joel)
November 14, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest.(Cope, Joel)
November 8, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest answer due 11/14/2018. Attorney Appearance due by 11/18/2018. State Court Motions due by 11/22/2018. (wwp)
November 8, 2018 Filing 3 REMOVAL NOTICE to all Counsel of Record re #1 Notice of Removal. Set/Reset Deadlines: Appearance Compliance due by 11/18/2018. (evs) Modified on 11/8/2018 (evs) Modified on 11/8/2018 (wwp).
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 11/07/2018. (evs) Modified on 11/8/2018 (evs).
November 7, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest from State Court of Chatham County, case number STCV1801640. ( Filing fee paid on 11/07/2018 - $400.00; receipt number 113J-2478557)(Chao, Frank I.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - State Court Documents, #3 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(evs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salas et al v. Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Salas
Represented By: J. Scott Vaughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margarita Salas
Represented By: J. Scott Vaughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest
Represented By: Frank I Chao
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Melcher
Represented By: Joel Randolph Cope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?