Oliver v. Lyft, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Oliver
Defendant: Lyft, Inc., Logan Green, Kristin Sverchek and John Zimmer
Case Number: 4:2018cv00270
Filed: November 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: James E Graham
Referring Judge: William T Moore
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER dismissing as moot #46 Motion for Bond; dismissing as moot #48 Motion for service of summons and complaint by the United States Marshals Service; Approving re #56 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal. Each party shall bear its own fees and costs. The Clerk is DIRECTED to close this case. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 12/19/18. (loh)
December 17, 2018 Filing 56 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Anthony Oliver. (jrb)
December 12, 2018 Filing 55 RESPONSE in Opposition re #48 MOTION for Service of Summons and Complaint by the Third States Marshal's Service filed by Lyft, Inc. (Hart, Daniel) Modified on 12/13/2018 (wwp).
December 10, 2018 Filing 54 REPLY to Response to Motion re #46 MOTION for Bond Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Post Contempt Bond and to Meet Other Pre-Filing Conditions AMENDED filed by Lyft, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hart, Daniel)
December 10, 2018 Filing 53 REPLY to Response to Motion re #46 MOTION for Bond Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Post Contempt Bond and to Meet Other Pre-Filing Conditions filed by Lyft, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hart, Daniel)
November 28, 2018 Filing 52 ***Document filed in error and has been removed from public view* (wwp) Modified on 11/28/2018 (wwp).
November 28, 2018 Filing 51 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Anthony Oliver re #49 Notice of Filing, #48 MOTION (wwp)
November 28, 2018 Filing 50 Document filed in error and has been removed from public view***leave to amend. (wwp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/28/2018: #1 env) (wwp). Modified on 11/28/2018 (wwp).
November 28, 2018 Filing 49 NOTICE to withdraw by Anthony Oliver #32 MOTION for leave to amend and proposed first amended complaint. (wwp)
November 28, 2018 Filing 48 MOTION for service of summons and complaint by the United States Marshals Service by Anthony Oliver. REFERRED to Judge James E. Graham.(wwp)
November 26, 2018 Filing 47 RESPONSE in Opposition re #46 MOTION for Bond to Compel Plaintiff to Post Contempt Bond and to Meet Other Pre-Filing Conditions filed by Anthony Oliver. (wwp)
November 21, 2018 Filing 46 ******* MOTION for Bond to Compel Plaintiff to Post Contempt Bond and to Meet Other Pre-Filing Conditions by Lyft, Inc.. Responses due by 12/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Hart, Daniel) Modified on 11/26/2018 (wwp).
November 21, 2018 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel P. Hart on behalf of Lyft, Inc. (Hart, Daniel)
November 21, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #46 MOTION for Bond Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Post Contempt Bond and to Meet Other Pre-Filing Conditions. (wwp)
November 15, 2018 Filing 44 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD re #43 Case Transferred In - District Transfer. (loh)
November 15, 2018 Filing 43 Case transfer in from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:18-cv-05505. Case transferred electronically
October 24, 2018 Filing 42 DECLARATION in Opposition to #41 Brief, as defense counsel continues to file frivolous motions after this case had been closed filed byAnthony Oliver. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email from Plaintiff to Defense Counsel and the State Bar of California)(Related document(s) #41 ) (Oliver, Anthony) (Filed on 10/24/2018)
October 24, 2018 Filing 41 Brief In Opposition to ECF No. 33 [Lyft Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction] filed byLyft, Inc.. (Overbeck, Marja-Liisa) (Filed on 10/24/2018)
October 24, 2018 Filing 40 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #39 MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Compel Individual Arbitration and to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(1) ) filed byAnthony Oliver. (Oliver, Anthony) (Filed on 10/24/2018)
October 24, 2018 Filing 39 MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Compel Individual Arbitration and to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(1) filed by Lyft, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/30/2018 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 11/7/2018. Replies due by 11/14/2018. (Overbeck, Marja-Liisa) (Filed on 10/24/2018)
October 24, 2018 Filing 38 Statement of Non-Opposition to ECF No. 28 [Plaintiff's Motion To Compel Individual Arbitration] filed byLyft, Inc.. (Overbeck, Marja-Liisa) (Filed on 10/24/2018)
October 23, 2018 Filing 37 EXHIBITS re #36 Notice (Other), filed byAnthony Oliver. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email from Business Insider reporter who reports Antitrust Violations, #2 Exhibit B - Email from Los Angeles Times Reporter)(Related document(s) #36 ) (Oliver, Anthony) (Filed on 10/23/2018)
October 23, 2018 Filing 36 NOTICE by Anthony Oliver re #34 Statement of Non-Opposition, Non-Opposition of this case being tranferred to the Southern District of Georgia, but objects to order for litigation bond order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email from USA Today news reporter to Plaintiff, #2 Exhibit B - Email from WTOC news reporter to Plaintiff, #3 Exhibit C - Oliver v. Lyft, Inc., Small Claims Court of Georgia)(Oliver, Anthony) (Filed on 10/23/2018)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 23, 2018. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2018)
October 22, 2018 Filing 34 Statement of Non-Opposition re #31 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern or Southern District of Georgia Lyft's Statement of Non-Opposition To Transfer Case to the Southern District of Georgia filed byLyft, Inc.. (Related document(s) #31 ) (Overbeck, Marja-Liisa) (Filed on 10/22/2018)
October 22, 2018 Filing 33 Ex Parte Application of Plaintiff for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Regarding Preliminary Injunction filed by Anthony Oliver. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Photos of Plaintiff's Vehicle that Defendants stated was involved in a car accident, #2 Exhibit B - Screen shots of Plaintiffs Lyft Application, #3 Exhibit C - Email from Defendants stating Plaintiff was drinking and driving with passengers, #4 Exhibit D - Receipt reflecting that Plaintiff paid for a drug and alcohol test, #5 Exhibit E - Plaintiffs drug and alcohol tests indicating that Plaintiff alcohol was negative for the presence of alcohol, #6 Exhibit F - Email from Defendants containing inaccurate back ground check results and notice of back ground check 8 months after Plaintiff was hired, #7 Exhibit G - News release from San Francisco County District Attorneys Office, #8 Exhibit H - Email from California Attorney Edwin I. Aimufua to Lyft defense attorney in support of Plaintiffs Ex Parte Application, #9 Declaration of Plaintiff Anthony Oliver in Support of Ex Parte Application, #10 Proposed Order)(Oliver, Anthony) (Filed on 10/22/2018)
October 19, 2018 Filing 32 MOTION to Amend/Correct to File a First Amended Complaint for Damages and Injunctive Relief for Violations of Federal Antitrust Law filed by Anthony Oliver. Motion Hearing set for 11/23/2018 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 11/2/2018. Replies due by 11/9/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Damages and Inunctive Relief for Violations of Federal Antitrust Law)(Oliver, Anthony) (Filed on 10/19/2018)
October 15, 2018 Filing 31 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern or Southern District of Georgia filed by Anthony Oliver. Motion Hearing set for 11/16/2018 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 10/29/2018. Replies due by 11/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Oliver, Anthony) (Filed on 10/15/2018)
October 11, 2018 Filing 30 CLERK'S NOTICE CORRECTING DOCKET ENTRY AND HEARING DATE TO NOVEMBER 9, 2018: Plaintiff's Motion to Compel noticed for hearing on 11/9/2018 was incorrectly entered into the docket for 11/2/2018.. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), Set/Reset Deadlines as to #28 MOTION to Compel Individual Arbitration and to Stay this Case pending resolution of Arbitration. Motion Hearing reset to 11/9/2018 at 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2018)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO RELIEVE PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY OF RECORD. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 10, 2018. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2018)
October 10, 2018 Filing 28 MOTION to Compel Individual Arbitration and to Stay this Case pending resolution of Arbitration filed by Anthony Oliver. Motion Hearing set for 11/2/2018 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 10/24/2018. Replies due by 10/31/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Arbitration agreement between Plaintiff and Defendant Lyft, Inc., #2 Exhibit B - Driver addendum between Plaintiff and Defendant Lyft, Inc., #3 Exhibit C - Drug and Alcohol screening receipt paid for by Plaintiff, #4 Exhibit D - Email from Defendant Lyft, Inc. to Plaintiff suspending Plaintiff for allegedly drinking and driving, #5 Declaration of Plaintiff in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Case, #6 Proposed Order)(Oliver, Anthony) (Filed on 10/10/2018)
October 10, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE by Anthony Oliver re #26 Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Complaint for Damages and Injunctive Relief, #2 Exhibit B - Summons, #3 Exhibit C - Civil Case Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit D - Proof Service)(Oliver, Anthony) (Filed on 10/10/2018)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 10, 2018. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2018)
October 10, 2018 Filing 25 Declaration of Plaintiff Anthony Oliver in Support of #23 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed byAnthony Oliver. (Related document(s) #23 ) (Oliver, Anthony) (Filed on 10/10/2018)
October 9, 2018 Filing 24 Statement re #22 Emergency MOTION Motion to Relieve Plaintiff's Counsel by Lyft, Inc.. (Overbeck, Marja-Liisa) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
October 8, 2018 Filing 23 [PROPOSED] Order re Substitution of Counsel Anthony Oliver (Oliver, Anthony) (Filed on 10/8/2018) Modified on 10/9/2018 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
October 5, 2018 Filing 22 Emergency MOTION Motion to Relieve Plaintiff's Counsel filed by Anthony Oliver. Responses due by 10/19/2018. Replies due by 10/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email from Defendant to Plaintiff, #2 Exhibit B - Test Receiept, #3 Proposed Order)(Oliver, Anthony) (Filed on 10/5/2018)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/7/2018 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/30/2018.. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 10/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order of Judge Maxine M. Chesney, #2 Standing Order of All Judges)(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2018)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.'S MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. Lyft's time to respond to plaintiff's complaint is extended by twenty-day (21) days, specifically, to October 24, 2018. Signed on October 2, 2018 by Judge Richard Seeborg for Maxine M. Chesney. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2018)
September 28, 2018 Filing 19 REPLY (re #16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint ) filed byAnthony Oliver. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Aimufua, Edwin) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case Reassigned to Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/28/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
September 27, 2018 Filing 17 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Lyft, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Rakuten, Inc. for Lyft, Inc.. (Olasa, Kuruvilla) (Filed on 9/27/2018)
September 27, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Lyft, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Kuruvilla Olasa, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Olasa, Kuruvilla) (Filed on 9/27/2018)
September 27, 2018 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2018)
September 27, 2018 Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Anthony Oliver.. (Aimufua, Edwin) (Filed on 9/27/2018)
September 26, 2018 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 10/10/2018. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2018)
September 26, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Edwin Ikponmwosa Aimufua (Aimufua, Edwin) (Filed on 9/26/2018)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler denying #10 Motion for Discovery. Plaintiff Anthony Oliver has filed a motion for leave to take early discovery of the defendants so that he can issue 500 requests for admission, 100 requests for production and interrogatories, a Rule 30(b)(6) deposition of defendant Lyft, Inc., and depositions of the three individual defendants. In light of the fact that the defendants have not appeared and all of the relevant circumstances, the court holds that the early discovery that Mr. Oliver requests is not warranted here and denies Mr. Oliver's motion.Going forward, if any discovery disputes arise, in lieu of filing discovery motions, the parties must comply with the dispute procedures in the court's standing order (attached). The procedures in it require, among other things, that the parties meet and confer on discovery disputes and that if a meet and confer by other means does not resolve the parties' dispute, the parties must meet and confer in person (if they/counsel are local) and then submit a joint letter brief with information about any unresolved disputes. The letter brief must be filed under the Civil Events category of "Motions and Related Filings > Motions - General > Discovery Letter Brief." After reviewing the joint letter brief, the court will evaluate whether further proceedings are necessary, including any further briefing or argument. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2018)
September 17, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Discovery filed by Anthony Oliver. Motion Hearing set for 10/18/2018 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 10/1/2018. Replies due by 10/9/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Limited Discovery, #2 Exhibit A - Driver addemdum for Plaintiff, #3 Proposed Order)(Oliver, Anthony) (Filed on 9/17/2018)
September 13, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anthony Oliver. Lyft, Inc. served on 9/11/2018, answer due 10/2/2018. (Oliver, Anthony) (Filed on 9/13/2018)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler granting #5 Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2018)
September 7, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Interested Parties by Anthony Oliver (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2018)
September 7, 2018 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Anthony Oliver.. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2018)
September 7, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by Anthony Oliver. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2018)
September 7, 2018 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 9/21/2018. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2018)
September 7, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Logan Green, Lyft, Inc., Kristin Sverchek, John Zimmer. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2018)
September 7, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/29/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/6/2018 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/11/2018: #1 order) (fabS, COURT STAFF).
September 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Logan Green, Lyft, Inc., Kristin Sverchek, John Zimmer (Filing fee $ 400.). Filed byAnthony Oliver. Consent/Declination due by 9/21/2018. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oliver v. Lyft, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyft, Inc.
Represented By: Marja-Liisa Overbeck
Represented By: Kuruvilla Joseph Olasa
Represented By: Daniel P. Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Logan Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristin Sverchek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Zimmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Oliver
Represented By: Edwin Ikponmwosa Aimufua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?