Dossey v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Cheryl Renee Dossey
Defendant: Commissioner Nancy A. Berryhill
Undetermined: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2019cv00035
Filed: February 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
Presiding Judge: William T Moore
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon Heath Statkus on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill (Statkus, Shannon)
February 15, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration. (trb)
February 14, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Submitted (Rouse, Christopher)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 2/13/19. (trb)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 GENERAL ORDER FOR SOCIAL SECURITY APPEALS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 2/13/19. (loh)
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Cheryl Renee Dossey. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray.(loh)
February 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill, filed by Cheryl Renee Dossey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(loh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dossey v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Renee Dossey
Represented By: Christopher L. Rouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Shannon Heath Statkus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?