Housey v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Corey Housey
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Undetermined: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2019cv00037
Filed: February 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. PLRA due by 5/2/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 3/18/19. (trb)
March 13, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Corey Housey. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Short Form)(Gibney, Lawrence) Modified on 3/13/2019 (trb).
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 GENERAL ORDER FOR SOCIAL SECURITY APPEALS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 03/07/2019. (evk)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Fee Deficiency. Set Deadlines: Compliance due by 3/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Blank Motion to Proceed IFP form)(evk)
February 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill, filed by Corey Housey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Appeals Council Action)(evk) Modified on 2/19/2019 (evk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Housey v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Housey
Represented By: Lawrence John Gibney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?